EP1214158 - DEVICE FOR RAISING AND WITHDRAWING A BACK-UP ROLL BEARING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Karl-Friedrich Im Streitplatz 3 57339 Erndtebrück / DE | 02 /
KUNZE, Volker An der Höh 14 57076 Siegen / DE | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00962495.8 | 16.09.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000EP09058 | Priority number, date | DE1999145070 | 20.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19945070 | [2002/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0121333 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1214158 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214158 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/00 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
B21B31/074 (EP,US);
B21B31/08 (EP,KR,US);
B21B2203/30 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53865 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/43] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUF- UND ABZIEHEN EINER STÜTZWALZEN-LAGEREINHEIT | [2002/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR RAISING AND WITHDRAWING A BACK-UP ROLL BEARING UNIT | [2002/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR INSTALLER ET RETIRER UN PALIER D'UN CYLINDRE D'APPUI | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 13.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.10.2003 | IE | 22.10.2003 | DK | 22.01.2004 | PT | 22.03.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | IE | 22.10.2003 | |
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | IE | 22.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4286830 (SALTER JR LOWELL S) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4352229 (MOORE JR EDWARD A) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19503682 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-5* column 3 - column 4; figure - *; | [E]EP1072333 (MORGAN CONSTRUCTION CO [US]) [E] 1 * the whole document * |