EP1243555 - FINE PARTICULATE TITANIUM OXIDE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2007/46] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Jun Showa Titanium Co., Ltd., 3-1, Nishinomiyamachi Toyama-shi, Toyama 931-8577 / JP | 02 /
KAYAMA, Susumu Showa Titanium Co., Ltd., 3-1, Nishinomiyamachi Toyama-shi, Toyama 931-8577 / JP | 03 /
YAMAYA, Hayato Showa Denko K.K., 13-9, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/39] | Application number, filing date | 00962876.9 | 27.09.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000JP06652 | Priority number, date | JP19990272159 | 27.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27215999 | US20000232852P | 15.09.2000 Original published format: US 232852 P | [2002/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123305 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243555 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243555 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01G23/07, C09C1/36 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C01G23/047 (EP);
C01G23/07 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2002/39] | C01G23/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/39] | Title | German: | FEINE TITANOXIDPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [2002/39] | English: | FINE PARTICULATE TITANIUM OXIDE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2002/39] | French: | OXYDE DE TITANE A PARTICULES FINES ET PROCEDE POUR LE PRODUIRE | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2002 | Translation filed | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2007 | BE | 14.11.2007 | CH | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | LI | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/13] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3219411 (CHEEVER GORDON D, et al) [A] 1-10* example 1 *; | [X]DE1667839 (BAYER AG) [X] 1 * page 7, lines 1-5; example 2 *; | [XA]EP0826633 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * example 10 * [A] 3,4; | [E]EP1231186 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [E] 1-10 * example 3 * | International search | [A]JPH06340423 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK); | [X]US5508015 (GONZALEZ RAUL A [US], et al); | [X]JPH10251021 (SHOWA DENKO KK) |