11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
01.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
23.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
06.01.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
14.01.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |
22.12.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.12.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.05.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.04.2004 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
30.04.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
28.04.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.04.2004 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2003 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.11.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
25.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.05.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
03.05.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
26.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|