Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020034195 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4995389B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2012 | B2 | JP2003528582 | 30.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7476700 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1214421 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2005 | B1 | EP1214421 | 19.06.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE290085T | 15.03.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0014229 | 30.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2384954 | 14.12.2010 | C | CA2384954 | 29.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60018437T | 16.02.2006 | T2 | DE60018437D1 | 07.04.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1214421T | 20.06.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP00963337 | 11.09.2000 | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02003035 | 23.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20021386L | 13.05.2002 | L | NO20021386D0 | 20.03.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ518004 | 29.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0024751 | 11.09.2000 | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0121809 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2001 | A3 | WO0121809 | 29.03.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100378224C | 02.04.2008 | C | CN1391611 | 15.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6168936 | 02.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US40147699 | 22.09.1999 |