EP1214427 - 26176, A NOVEL CALPAIN PROTEASE AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPELLER-LIBERMANN, Rosana 86 Beacon Street Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMSON, Mark 15 Stonecrest Drive Saugus, MA 01906 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00963341.3 | 08.09.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000US24790 | Priority number, date | US19990392189 | 09.09.1999 Original published format: US 392189 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0118216 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1214427 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/57, C12N9/64, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C07K16/40, C12Q1/37, C12Q1/68, A61K38/48 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
C12N9/6472 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 26176, EINE CALPAINPROTEASE UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2002/25] | English: | 26176, A NOVEL CALPAIN PROTEASE AND USES THEREOF | [2002/25] | French: | NOUVELLE PROTEASE CALPAINE 26176 ET UTILISATIONS | [2002/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 10.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/52] | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19737105 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0799892 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) | [X] - FRANZ TANNA ET AL, "Capn7: A highly divergent vertebrate calpain with a novel C-terminal domain.", MAMMALIAN GENOME, (199903), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 0938-8990, pages 318 - 321, XP001002538 [X] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s003359900995 | [ ] - EMBL, (19990501), XP002168668 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - FUTAI E ET AL, "Molecular cloning of Pa1BH, a mammalian homologue of the Aspergillus atypical calpain Pa1B.", EMBL, (19990615), XP002168481 [X] 1-23 * abstract * | [X] - "National Cancer Institute, Cancer Genome Anatomy Project", EMBL, (19970421), XP002168482 [X] 1-23 * abstract * | [X] - "National Cancer Institute, Cancer Genome Anatomy Project", EMBL, (19980818), XP002168483 [X] 1-23 * abstract * |