|
17.10.2008 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Decision on interlocutory revision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.01.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.01.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.10.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.03.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
140 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
44 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
94 |