EP1222337 - DUAL VOLUME DISCHARGE OUTLET VALVE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VGM (Aust) Pty Ltd 38 Barrett-Lennard Parade Winthrop, W.A. 6150 / AU | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOO, Kah, Hin 38 Barrett-Lennard Parade Winthrop, W.A. 6150 / AU | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00963810.7 | 15.09.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000AU01120 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ02935 | 16.09.1999 Original published format: AU PQ293599 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0120085 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222337 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/30 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
E03D1/144 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/29] | E03D1/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEITEILIGES AUSLASSVENTIL | [2002/29] | English: | DUAL VOLUME DISCHARGE OUTLET VALVE APPARATUS | [2002/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EVACUATION CLAPET DE REFOULEMENT VOLUME DOUBLE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 12.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5075907 (HARRIS JOHN L [US]) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column 7, line 21 - line 54; figures 7-13 *; | [X]US5205000 (XIA FRANK Z [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 6 - line 9 ** column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 2 *; | [X]US5341520 (LAZAR VLADIMIR F [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 2, line 44 - line 57 * | International search | [X]AU4317785 (HEYWOOD G T); | [X]AU559249B (CAROMA IND LTD); | [X]US4811432 (HARRIS JOHN L [US]); | [X]DD268265 (ROEHRSDORF MECHANISIERUNG [DD]); | [X]AU1060892 (ETABLISSEMENTS PORCHER); | [X]US5465432 (MILLER JOHN B [US]); | [X]AU3916695 (GEBERIT TECHNIK AG); | [A]AU4080496 (GEBERIT INT AG); | [X]WO9629481 (FLUIDMASTER [US], et al); | [X]WO9717503 (RAGOT CLAUDE [FR]) |