EP1140585 - WIPER BLADE FOR GLASS SURFACES OF MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/01] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTLARSKI, Thomas Westerwaldstrasse 16 53474 Bad Neuenahr / DE | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 00963935.2 | 30.08.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000DE02951 | Priority number, date | DE1999151363 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19951363 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0130618 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140585 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140585 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B60S1/38 (EP,KR,US);
B60S1/3889 (EP,US);
B60S1/3851 (EP,US);
B60S1/3891 (EP,US);
B60S2001/382 (EP,US);
B60S2001/3822 (EP,US);
B60S2001/3836 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WISCHBLATT FÜR SCHEIBEN VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | [2001/41] | English: | WIPER BLADE FOR GLASS SURFACES OF MOTOR VEHICLES | [2001/41] | French: | RACLETTE D'ESSUIE-GLACE POUR LES VITRES DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 25.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Request for further processing for: | 18.05.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 04.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0012251 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 30 *; | [D]DE2853487 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [XA]EP0646507 (TRICO PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column A; figures 1-6 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 47 * [A] 2; | [XA]DE19729864 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 65 * * column 4, line 10 - line 34 * [A] 2 | by applicant | DE2853487 |