EP1214133 - SYSTEM FILTER FOR POND WATER OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oase GmbH Tecklenburger Strasse 161 48477 Hörstel / DE | [2005/14] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Oase GmbH & Co. KG Tecklenburger Strasse 161 48477 Hörstel / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Oase Wübker GmbH & Co. KG Tecklenburger Strasse 161 48477 Hörstel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMEIER, Dieter Münsterstrasse 255 D-49479 Ibbenbüren / DE | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Henze, Lothar, et al Meissner & Meissner Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Henze, Lothar, et al Meissner & Meissner Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | Möbus, Steffen Kayser & Möbus Patentanwälte Leienfelsstrasse 6 81243 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00963943.6 | 31.08.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000DE02964 | Priority number, date | DE1999142188 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942188 | [2002/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0117660 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1214133 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214133 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/00, B01D36/02, C02F9/00 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
A01K63/045 (EP);
B01D29/15 (EP);
B01D29/54 (EP);
B01D29/58 (EP);
B01D29/902 (EP);
B01D29/925 (EP);
C02F1/325 (EP);
C02F9/20 (EP);
B01D2201/088 (EP);
B01D2201/287 (EP);
B01D2201/4084 (EP);
B01D2201/46 (EP);
C02F2201/003 (EP);
C02F2201/3223 (EP);
C02F3/02 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/18] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEMFILTER FÜR TEICHWASSER O. DGL. | [2002/25] | English: | SYSTEM FILTER FOR POND WATER OR THE LIKE | [2002/25] | French: | SYSTEME DE FILTRAGE POUR EAUX D'ETANG OU ANALOGUE | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 14.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.11.2002 | 31.08.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.05.2005 | FR | 04.05.2005 | IE | 04.05.2005 | IT | 04.05.2005 | NL | 04.05.2005 | DK | 04.08.2005 | GR | 04.08.2005 | SE | 04.08.2005 | ES | 15.08.2005 | AT | 31.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | CY | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | LU | 31.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 17.10.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
IT | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
AT | 31.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CY | 31.08.2005 | ||
FR | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
IT | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
AT | 31.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CY | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
AT | 31.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
CY | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
AT | 31.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
AT | 31.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
IE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 04.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4909937 (HOFFMANN JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US5078876 (WHITTIER SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US5290437 (LIN CHIU-CHAN [TW]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5496468 (CORMIER REGINALD [CA]) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]US5632890 (SUGIMOTO AKITOSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * |