EP1210485 - REINFORCED CONCRETE PART FOR PRODUCING FOUNDATIONS OF BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sohns, Udo Zum Marstall 20 54608 Brandscheid / DE | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Schmetz, Bruno Augustastrasse 14-16 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Schmetz, Bruno, Dipl.-Ing. Augustastrasse 14-16 52070 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00964057.4 | 29.08.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000EP08422 | Priority number, date | DE1999141603 | 01.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19941603 | [2002/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0116441 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1210485 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1210485 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/86 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
E04B2/8611 (EP,US);
E04B2002/867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Title | German: | STAHLBETONTEIL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FUNDAMENTEN FÜR BAUWERKE | [2002/23] | English: | REINFORCED CONCRETE PART FOR PRODUCING FOUNDATIONS OF BUILDINGS | [2002/23] | French: | PIECE EN BETON ARME POUR FONDATIONS POUR BATIMENTS | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 23.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Request for further processing for: | 16.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.04.2005 | FI | 27.04.2005 | GB | 27.04.2005 | IE | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2005 | CY | 29.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/08] | ES | 27.04.2005 | |
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
GB | 27.04.2005 | ||
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
GB | 27.04.2005 | ||
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
GB | 27.04.2005 | ||
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
GB | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
GB | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 27.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2198036 (WESSEL WILLI [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0090303 (CELLA GIOVANNI) [X] 1,3-5* page 1, line 32 - page 3, line 24; figure - *; | [X]US5802793 (DEVORE JR WALTER DON [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 46; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE19808509 (BEUTELROCK [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * |