EP1230179 - MANUFACTURE OF MINERAL WOOL PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwool International A/S Hovedgaden 501 2640 Hedehusene / DK | [2004/14] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Rockwool International A/S Hovedgaden 501 DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rasmussen, Svend Grove Straedet 2, Herslev DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00964139.0 | 08.09.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000EP08771 | Priority number, date | GB19990021841 | 15.09.1999 Original published format: GB 9921841 | EP19990309256 | 11.11.1999 Original published format: EP 99309256 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0119742 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230179 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1230179 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/05 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
C03B37/055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/41] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 20.03.2002 | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON PRODUKTEN AUS MINERALWOLLE | [2002/33] | English: | MANUFACTURE OF MINERAL WOOL PRODUCTS | [2002/33] | French: | FABRICATION DE PRODUITS DE LAINE MINERALE | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 28.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | CY | 31.03.2004 | IT | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | ES | 12.07.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | IE | 08.09.2004 | LU | 08.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
CY | 31.03.2004 | ||
IT | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
LU | 08.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
CY | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
LU | 08.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 30.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9206047 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5131935 (DEBOUZIE ALAIN [FR], et al) [AD] 1 * column W *; | [AD]WO9212939 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9212940 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [AD] 1* column W *; | [AD]WO9638391 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |