EP1141956 - METHOD OF IMMEDIATE WRITING OR READING FILES ON A DISC LIKE RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IJTSMA, Pope Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5581 AW Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HAMELINCK, Dirk Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5581 AW Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
NIJBOER, Jacob, G. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5581 AW Eindhoven / NL | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | De Vries, Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | De Vries, Jan Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 00964167.1 | 13.09.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000EP08975 | Priority number, date | EP19990203111 | 23.09.1999 Original published format: EP 99203111 | EP20000200290 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: EP 00200290 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0122416 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141956 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141956 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B27/32 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G11B20/1217 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/0045 (KR);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B20/1889 (KR);
G11B7/00736 (KR);
G11B2020/10861 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2020/1288 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1289 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM UNMITTELBAREN SCHREIBEN ODER LESEN VON DATEIEN AUF EIN PLATTENÄHNLICHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2001/41] | English: | METHOD OF IMMEDIATE WRITING OR READING FILES ON A DISC LIKE RECORDING MEDIUM | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE D'ECRITURE OU DE LECTURE IMMEDIATE DE FICHIERS SUR UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DU TYPE DISQUE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | IE | 13.09.2008 | LU | 13.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.09.2008 | ||
LU | 13.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/28] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.09.2008 | ||
LU | 13.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
NL | 14.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0541219 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-4,12,14,18 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - line 44 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 43 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 21 * * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 32 * * figures 6,9C; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5623470 (ASTHANA PRAVEEN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12-14,18,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 9 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0798711 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-6,12,14,18,20 * page 10, line 32 - page 15, line 39 * * figure 12 *; | [A]EP0798716 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,12-14,18,20 * figures 3,4,10 * * column 4, line 22 - line 40 ** column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 6 *; | [AP]EP1014365 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1,2,6,7,10,12-14,18-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 13 * * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 7 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 30 * |