EP1233677 - SLOW MELTING COATING FOR ICE CONFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Service des Brevets Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Service des Brevets Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEST, Eric, Thomas 6267 Wexford Woods Drive Dublin, OH 43016 / US | 02 /
COULTER, Linda 1673 Compton Road Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 / US | 03 /
ERICKSON DECRUZ, Julia, Ellen 650 S.W. Lookout Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Archambault, Jean 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [2002/35] | Application number, filing date | 00964233.1 | 25.09.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000EP09369 | Priority number, date | US19990425045 | 22.10.1999 Original published format: US 425045 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0130175 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233677 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233677 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/00, A23G9/02 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
A23G9/322 (EP,US);
A23G9/48 (EP,US);
A23G2200/00 (EP,US);
A23G2200/06 (EP,US);
A23G2210/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23G9/322, A23G2200/00 (US,EP);
A23G9/322, A23G2200/06 (US,EP);
A23G9/322, A23G2210/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/35] | Title | German: | LANGSAM SCHMELZENDER ÜBERZUG FÜR SPEISEEIS | [2002/35] | English: | SLOW MELTING COATING FOR ICE CONFECTIONS | [2002/35] | French: | ENROBAGE A FONTE LENTE POUR CONFISERIES GLACEES | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | BE | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | CY | 25.09.2005 | IE | 26.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | PT | 14.11.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 26.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 26.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0429817 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5306519 (PETERSON BENJAMIN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-20* column 4, line 36 - column 4, line 53 * |