EP1218614 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/27] | WINDOW AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
[2007/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zöllner, Ronald Donauwörther Strasse 38a 86154 Augsburg / DE | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states HAMPEL-ZÖLLNER, Gesellschaft für klassisches Fenster-Design mbH Bibertalstrasse 57 86485 Biberbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPEL, Manfred Donauwörtherstrasse 38 a 86154 Augsburg / DE | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | Alber, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Hansmann & Vogeser, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00964268.7 | 02.10.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000EP09668 | Priority number, date | DE1999147108 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19947108 | [2002/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123699 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218614 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1218614 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/54, E06B3/20 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
E06B3/10 (EP);
E06B3/54 (EP);
E06B3/549 (EP);
E06B3/685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, LU [2004/20] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES FENSTERS | [2007/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A WINDOW | [2007/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FENETRE | [2007/17] |
Former [2002/27] | FENSTER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2002/27] | WINDOW AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
Former [2002/27] | FENETRE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2047299 (M.MEISINGER) [X] 1,5,11,14-16,25,27 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2146250 (HAEUFGLOECKNER HELMUT) [A] 1,4,5,11,14 * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 11, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [X]DE2314303 (MEETH ERNST JOSEF) [X] 15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2258510 (CEGEDUR [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,14 * figure 20 *; | [X]FR2473609 (DIAZ FERNANDEZ JOSE [ES]) [X] 1,2,8,14,25,27,28 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE3002221 (WINTERFELD JOACHIM VON) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,25,27,28,30 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 22, paragraph 1 * * figures 3-11 * [Y] 3,9-14,26,29; | [A]US4563846 (WEBB DALE P [US]) [A] 2,10,11,15-17,26,29 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 27 * * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 51 ** figure - *; | [Y]FR2669673 (HERBERT TONY [FR]) [Y] 3,29 * the whole document *; | [XAY]DE19516486 (FINGERLING KARL HEINZ [DE]) [X] 15,16,23 * the whole document * [A] 1,4,25 [Y] 9-14,26; | [XA]DE19648235 (PUREN SCHAUMSTOFF GMBH [DE]) [X] 15-24 * the whole document * [A] 26 |