EP1133720 - KEYBOARD FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Psion Digital Limited 85 Frampton Street London NW8 8NQ / GB | [2001/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMPSEY, Mark 32 Stanley Avenue Beckenham, Kent BR3 6PX / GB | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Langley, Peter James Origin Limited Twisden Works Twisden Road London NW5 1DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Langley, Peter James Origin Limited, 52 Muswell Hill Road London N10 3JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00964410.5 | 27.09.2000 | [2001/38] | WO2000GB03700 | Priority number, date | GB19990022775 | 28.09.1999 Original published format: GB 9922775 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123990 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133720 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133720 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02, H01H13/70 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
H01H13/705 (EP,US);
H01H2221/006 (EP,US);
H01H2221/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/38] | Title | German: | TASTATUR FÜR EIN ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2001/38] | English: | KEYBOARD FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2001/38] | French: | CLAVIER POUR DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE | [2001/38] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 08.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2004 | BE | 14.01.2004 | CH | 14.01.2004 | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | LI | 14.01.2004 | NL | 14.01.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | ES | 25.04.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | IE | 27.09.2004 | LU | 27.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
CY | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
IE | 27.09.2004 | ||
LU | 27.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
IE | 27.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
IE | 27.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2253586 (MITEL CORP [CA]) [A] 1,2,4-6* page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 30; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5360955 (ENGLISH GEORGE P [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6 * abstract *; | [Y]US5422447 (SPENCE KENNY R [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column 11, line 66 - column 12, line 11; figure -; claims 1,6,7 *; | [Y]US5874700 (HOCHGESANG GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * |