EP1229378 - LIQUID CRYSTAL ELEMENT, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE AND PRODUCTION METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIYAMA, Kazuhiro 33-10, Shakusonjicho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0081 / JP | 02 /
ASAYAMA, Junko C26-305, 2-2, Tsukumodai Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0862 / JP | 03 /
KOMORI, Kazunori 4-6-4-1007, Suzukakedai Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1322 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Yukio A-104, 19, Misasagitayamacho, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8405 / JP | 05 /
TAKIMOTO, Akio 4-1, Kunimatsucho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0016 / JP | 06 /
INOUE, Kazuo 4-5-8-306, Hoshigaoka Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0013 / JP | 07 /
KUMAGAWA, Katsuhiko 9-14-302, Midorimachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0022 / JP | 08 /
SATO, Ichiro 93-8, Higashikamiya, Higashi Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0362 / JP | 09 /
WAKEMOTO, Hirofumi 1-18-5, Teraji Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 921-8178 / JP | 10 /
KIZU, Noriyuki 1-471-102, Nukashinbo Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 921-8148 / JP | 11 /
KIMURA, Masanori 19-401, Shinmachi Daito-shi, Osaka 574-0037 / JP | 12 /
TSUDA, Keisuke Room 815 Apagardencourt Nonoichi 16-36, Yokomiyamachi, Nonoichimachi Ishikawa-gun, Ishikawa 921-8817 / JP | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/32] | 01 /
NISHIYAMA, Kazuhiro 33-10, Shakusonjicho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0081 / JP | ||
02 /
ASAYAMA, Junko C26-305, 2-2, Tsukumodai Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0862 / JP | |||
03 /
KOMORI, Kazunori 4-6-4-1007, Suzukakedai Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1322 / JP | |||
04 /
TANAKA, Yukio A-104, 19, Misasagitayamacho, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8405 / JP | |||
05 /
TAKIMOTO, Akio 4-1, Kunimatsucho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0016 / JP | |||
06 /
INOUE, Kazuo 4-5-8-306, Hoshigaoka Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0013 / JP | |||
07 /
KUMAGAWA, Katsuhiko 9-14-302, Midorimachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0022 / JP | |||
08 /
SATO, Ichiro 93-8, Higashikamiya, Higashi Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0362 / JP | |||
09 /
WAKEMOTO, Hirofumi 501, 2-8-38, Izumigaoka Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 921-8035 / JP | |||
10 /
KIZU, Noriyuki 1-471-102, Nukashinbo Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 921-8148 / JP | |||
11 /
KIMURA, Masanori 19-401, Shinmachi Daito-shi, Osaka 574-0037 / JP | |||
12 /
TSUDA, Keisuke 16-36-815, Yokomiyamachi, Nonoichimachi Ishikawa-gun, Ishikawa 921-8817 / JP | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00964742.1 | 06.10.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000JP07011 | Priority number, date | JP19990285549 | 06.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28554999 | JP19990303664 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30366499 | JP20000081206 | 23.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000081206 | JP20000114864 | 17.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000114864 | JP20000114871 | 17.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000114871 | JP20000182626 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000182626 | JP20000182628 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000182628 | JP20000182645 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000182645 | [2002/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0125843 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229378 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1339, G02F1/1368, G02F1/1343, C09K19/02 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
G02F1/133512 (EP,US);
G02F1/1337 (EP,US);
G02F1/1339 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1341 (EP,US);
G02F1/134363 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLELEMENT, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE UND DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2002/32] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL ELEMENT, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE AND PRODUCTION METHODS THEREFOR | [2002/32] | French: | ELEMENT A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, DISPOSITIF AFFICHEUR A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2002 | Translation filed | 03.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/51] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59226323 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [A]JPH06235923 (ROHM CO LTD); | [A]JPH05265012 ; | [A]JPH11119229 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JPH04319915 (SEIKOSHA KK); | [X]JPH06222372 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [Y]EP0855613 (FRONTEC INC [JP]); | [Y]JPH10186391 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH0695133 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [Y]JPS63121020 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH05224211 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH10319435 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPH1039297 (NEC CORP) |