|
06.10.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.10.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.08.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Deficiencies in translation of international application |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
23.06.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
23.06.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
53 |