Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1260538 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2010 | B1 | EP1260538 | 02.01.2003 | A4 | EP1260538 | 27.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000222815 | 24.07.2000 | JP32332699 | 12.11.1999 | JP0007013 | 06.10.2000 | JP28613199 | 06.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60045314D1 | 13.01.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000222815 | 24.07.2000 | JP32332699 | 12.11.1999 | JP0007013 | 06.10.2000 | JP28613199 | 06.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6790930 | 14.09.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000222815 | 24.07.2000 | JP32332699 | 12.11.1999 | JP0007013 | 06.10.2000 | JP28613199 | 06.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0125313 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000222815 | 24.07.2000 | JP32332699 | 12.11.1999 | JP28613199 | 06.10.1999 |