EP1214820 - PCM MODEM WITH PRECODING AND PRE-EQUALISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mindspeed Technologies, Inc. 4000 MacArthur Blvd., East Tower Newport Beach, CA 92660-3095 / US | [2009/13] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Mindspeed Technologies, Inc. 4000 MacArthur Blvd., East Tower Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | ||
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Conexant Systems, Inc. 4311 Jamboree Road Newport Beach, California 92660-3095 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLAFSSON, Sverrir Thingholtsstraeti 14 IS-101 Reykjavik / IS | 02 /
JONSSON, Olafur Fannafold 170A IS-101 Reykjavik / IS | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00964944.3 | 05.09.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000US24374 | Priority number, date | US19990395726 | 10.09.1999 Original published format: US 395726 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0119045 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214820 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214820 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49, H04L25/03 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
H04L25/4927 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PCM-MODEM MIT VORKODIERUNG UND VORENTZERRUNG | [2002/25] | English: | PCM MODEM WITH PRECODING AND PRE-EQUALISATION | [2002/25] | French: | MODEM PCM AVEC PRECODAGE ET PRE-EGALISATION | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9934565 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-31 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 27 * * page 9, line 23 - line 28 * * page 11, line 14 - page 19, line 31 *; | [A]WO9934566 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 2 * * page 3, line 8 - line 14 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 24 * * page 15, line 22 - page 16, line 12 * * claim - *; | [A]WO9813977 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * page 6, line 3 - line 6 * * page 14, line 1 - page 16, line 2 *; | [A]US5887027 (COHEN HERBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0669740 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-31 * page 7, line 39 - line 54 * * page 8, line 44 - page 9, line 17 *; | [A]WO9938299 (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 4 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 16 * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 20 *; | [A]EP0876030 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-31 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 18 * * column 11, line 40 - column 12, line 41; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0634856 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,7,11,16,18 * column 1, line 25 - line 28 * * claims 1,2 *; | [E]EP1049300 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [E] 21-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0065] * * claim - * | [A] - WARKE N ET AL, "On the next generation of high-speed voiceband modems", 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (CAT. NO. 99CH36311), 1999, Piscataway, NJ, USA, (19990606), ISBN 0-7803-5284-X, pages 256 - 260 vol.1, XP002155129 [A] 1-31 * page 256 - page 257 * * page 259, column L, paragraph 2 * | [A] - "Recommendation V.90", ITU-T TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARIZATION SECTOR OF ITU, (199809), page COMPLETE48, XP002107773 [A] 1,5-11,16-20 * page 7, paragraph 5.4.5 * * page 9, paragraph 5.4.5.5 - page 10 * |