EP1243045 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A FUEL PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DCNS SA 40-42, rue du Docteur Finlay 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/20] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states IdaTech, LLC. P.O. Box 5339 Bend Oregon 97708-5339 / US | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states IdaTech, LLC. P.O. Box 5339 Bend, Oregon 97708-5339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDLUND, David, J. 1698 Davenport Bend, OR 97701 / US | 02 /
HERRON, Thomas, G. 155 S.E. Windance Court Bend, OR 97702 / US | 03 /
PLEDGER, William, A. 69222 Harness Sisters, OR 97759 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York, YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York Y01 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2002/39] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00965316.3 | 21.09.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US26036 | Priority number, date | US19990414049 | 06.10.1999 Original published format: US 414049 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0126174 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243045 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243045 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L1/06 (EP,US);
B60L3/0053 (EP,US);
B60L3/04 (EP,US);
B60L50/72 (EP,US);
B60L58/31 (EP,US);
B60L58/34 (EP,US);
B60L58/40 (EP,US);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
B60L2240/36 (EP,US);
B60L2250/10 (EP,US);
B60L2250/12 (EP,US);
B60L2250/16 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP,US);
Y02T90/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE DES BETRIEBES EINES BRENNSTOFFVERARBEITENDEN SYSTEMS | [2002/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A FUEL PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2002/39] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE COMBUSTIBLE | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2004 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | IE | 21.09.2013 | LU | 21.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | ES | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9819960 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,12-32 * EP 0957063 taken as appropriate translation; citations refer to EP-document; paragraphs [0041] , [0047] , [0050] , [0055] , [0056] , [0058] , [0063] - [0065] - [0085] - [0088] - [0095] , [0122] , [0150] , [0153] *; | [X]EP0862234 (DBB FUEL CELL ENGINES GES MIT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12,16,18-29,32 * column 7, lines 22-55 *; | [X]US5401589 (PALMER IAN [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,12,15-29,31,32 * column 4, lines 21-48 * * column 6, lines 58-68 * * column 13, line 49 - column 16, line 28 * * column 18, lines 23-34 * * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0827226 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,12,13,16-19,25-29,32 * column 6, lines 39-52 * * column 10, lines 16-50 * | International search | [X]US3955941 (HOUSEMAN JOHN, et al); | [X]US4098960 (GAGNON RICHARD N); | [X]US4098959 (FANCIULLO SALVATORE); | [X]US4642273 (SASAKI AKIRA [JP]); | [X]US5712052 (KAWATSU SHIGEYUKI [JP]); | [YP]US6001499 (GROT STEPHEN ANDREAS [US], et al); | [YP]US5985474 (CHEN JEFFREY S [US], et al); | [Y]US5527632 (GARDNER FREDERICK J [GB]) |