EP1323932 - DEVICE FOR FIXING TOGETHER A PANEL AND A SUPPORT PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.T.W. España, S.A. Ctra. de Ribas Km. 31.7 08520 Les Franqueses Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states I.T.W. Espana, S.A. Ctra. de Ribas Km. 31.7 08520 Les Franqueses Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states I.T.W. Espana, S.A. Crta. de Ribas Km. 31.7 08520 Les Franqueses Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARES ISANTA, Albert Ctra. de Ribas Km. 31 7,Les Franqueses del Valles E-08520 Barcelona / ES | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 00966173.7 | 03.10.2000 | [2003/27] | WO2000ES00367 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0229260 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1323932 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323932 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/06, F16B21/07, B60R13/02 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
F16B5/065 (EP);
B60R13/0206 (EP);
F16B21/075 (EP);
F16B21/08 (EP);
F16B5/0628 (EP);
F16B5/0657 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER PLATTE UND EINER STÜTZSCHEIBE ANEINANDER | [2003/27] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING TOGETHER A PANEL AND A SUPPORT PLATE | [2003/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A L'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN PANNEAU SUR UNE PLAQUE DE SUPPORT | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2003 | Translation filed | 26.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2005 | BE | 27.04.2005 | CH | 27.04.2005 | FI | 27.04.2005 | FR | 27.04.2005 | LI | 27.04.2005 | NL | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2005 | DE | 28.07.2005 | CY | 03.10.2005 | GB | 03.10.2005 | IE | 03.10.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
CY | 03.10.2005 | ||
GB | 03.10.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
FR | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
CY | 03.10.2005 | ||
GB | 03.10.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
GB | 03.10.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 27.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2214348 (ITW DE FRANCE [FR]); | [A]GB2057554 (RAYMOND A); | [A]US4804303 (STATKUS ROBERT J [US]); | [Y]US5173026 (CORDOLA JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al); | [A]EP0524750 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]); | [Y]US5507610 (BENEDETTI NICHOLAS M [US], et al); | [A]GB2317199 (ROVER GROUP [GB]); | [A]US5975820 (KIRCHEN JAMES T [US]); | [Y]US6039523 (KRAUS WILLIBALD [DE]) |