EP1216129 - GAS OVEN FOR CONTINUOUS CURING IN PARTICULAR RUBBER PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements Paumelle 2, rue de l'Abbaye, Gruchet Le Valasse 76210 Bolbec / FR | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUMELLE, Roland, Marie-André Moulin Ste Catherine, La Vallée F-76560 Cherville / FR | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00966199.2 | 25.09.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000FR02645 | Priority number, date | FR19990012083 | 28.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9912083 | [2002/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123161 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216129 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216129 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C35/04, F27B9/10, F27B9/02 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
F27B9/10 (EP);
B29C35/0277 (EP);
B29C35/04 (EP);
F27B9/029 (EP);
F27B9/3011 (EP);
B29C35/045 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASDURCHLAUFOFEN INSBESONDERE FÜR KAUTSCHUK PRODUKTE | [2002/26] | English: | GAS OVEN FOR CONTINUOUS CURING IN PARTICULAR RUBBER PRODUCTS | [2002/26] | French: | FOUR A GAZ DE CUISSON EN CONTINU NOTAMMENT DE PRODUITS EN CAOUTCHOUC | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 04.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2003 | FI | 07.05.2003 | IE | 07.05.2003 | NL | 07.05.2003 | DK | 07.08.2003 | GR | 07.08.2003 | PT | 07.08.2003 | SE | 07.08.2003 | ES | 18.08.2003 | CY | 25.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/36] | AT | 07.05.2003 | |
FI | 07.05.2003 | ||
IE | 07.05.2003 | ||
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
DK | 07.08.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
CY | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 07.05.2003 | |
FI | 07.05.2003 | ||
IE | 07.05.2003 | ||
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
DK | 07.08.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 07.05.2003 | |
FI | 07.05.2003 | ||
IE | 07.05.2003 | ||
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 07.05.2003 | |
FI | 07.05.2003 | ||
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 07.05.2003 | |
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 07.05.2003 | |
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 07.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1029023 (SCHILDE MASCHB AG) [A] 1,5,3,4,6 * figure -; claim - * * column 3, line 13 - line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]GB987525 (COMPOSITE METAL PRODUCTS INC) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR1487750 (GOODRICH CO B F) [A] 1,5 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4270898 (KELLY STEPHEN B) [A] 8,9 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9011482 (REINBOLD HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5172848 (BARTEN BRIAN L [US], et al) [A] 1,3,7 * figure -; claim - * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5639418 (GREENWALD ROY J [US], et al) |