EP1215974 - HOOD FOR GEAR TO BE WORN IN A CLEAN ROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE NETTOYAGE ET DE DESINFECTION D'IVRY ( S.N.D.I.) Société Anonyme 14 Rue de Bassano F-75016 Paris / FR | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRET, Michel 60 rue Jean Longuet F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | 02 /
GUILLOTEAU, Eric 61 rue de la Procession Parc de la Chênaie no6 F-94370 Sucy en Brie / FR | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Colas, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Colas, Jean-Pierre Cabinet JP Colas 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00966239.6 | 29.09.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000FR02708 | Priority number, date | FR19990012154 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9912154 | [2002/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0122842 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1215974 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A42B1/04, A41D13/11 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
A41D13/1153 (EP);
A41D13/11 (EP);
A42B1/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/26] | Title | German: | SCHUTZHAUBE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI REINRÄUMEN | [2002/26] | English: | HOOD FOR GEAR TO BE WORN IN A CLEAN ROOM | [2002/26] | French: | CAGOULE POUR TENUE DE SALLE BLANCHE | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 24.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3885558 (N. L. BELKIN) [A] 1 * column 2, line 33 - column 4, line 24; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5253642 (STACKHOUSE INC.) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21 - line 53; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4589408 (KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB614668 (E. W. MOSS) [A] 1 * page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 12; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2304323 (MUTEXIL) [A] 1,4 * figures 1-3; claims 1-7 *; | [A]JPH10155924 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10155924 A 19980616 (GOORUDOUIN:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |