EP1223487 - OPERATION CONFIRMING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INDUSTRIAL MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | ||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA, Koji Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 02 /
NAKAZATO, Tatsumi Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00966524.1 | 16.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000JP07178 | Priority number, date | JP19990298859 | 20.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29885999 | [2002/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129629 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1223487 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1223487 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/406, B23Q15/00 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
G05B19/406 (EP,US);
B23Q15/00 (KR);
G05B19/425 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36472 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTÄTIGUNGSVERFAHREN EINES PROZESSES UND EINRICHTUNG FÜR INDUSTRIELLES MECHANISMUS | [2002/29] | English: | OPERATION CONFIRMING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INDUSTRIAL MACHINERY | [2002/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONFIRMATION D'OPERATION ET DISPOSITIF POUR MACHINERIE INDUSTRIELLE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2002 | Translation filed | 11.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 05.12.2007 | FR | 02.05.2008 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/44] | FR | 02.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4629860 (LINDBOM TORSTEN H [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 8, line 3 - column 9, line 12 *; | [A]US5198984 (YAMAGUCHI TAKAHIRO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 13 - line 29 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 28 * | International search | [A]JPH06187028 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD); | [A]JPH0553635 (HITACHI SEIKI KK) |