EP1185461 - A FOOD STORAGE, MIXING AND SERVING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KELLOGG COMPANY One Kellogg Plaza Battle Creek, MI 49016-3599 / US | [2006/07] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Kellogg Company One Kellogg Plaza Battle Creek, MI 49016-3599 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORGERSON, Michael, J. 178 Hidden Forest Road Battle Creek, MI 49014 / US | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00967054.8 | 29.09.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000US26734 | Priority number, date | US19990156839P | 30.09.1999 Original published format: US 156839 P | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123262 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185461 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185461 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32, B65D51/28 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
B65D81/3222 (EP,US);
B65D51/246 (EP,US);
Y10S215/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/11] | B65D25/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Title | German: | AUFBEWAHRUNGSBEHÄLTER ZUM MISCHEN UND BEDIENEN VON SPEISEN | [2002/11] | English: | A FOOD STORAGE, MIXING AND SERVING CONTAINER | [2002/11] | French: | RECIPIENT DE STOCKAGE, DE MELANGEAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION D'ALIMENTS | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 28.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2006 | BE | 15.02.2006 | CH | 15.02.2006 | CY | 15.02.2006 | FI | 15.02.2006 | FR | 15.02.2006 | IT | 15.02.2006 | LI | 15.02.2006 | NL | 15.02.2006 | DK | 15.05.2006 | SE | 15.05.2006 | DE | 16.05.2006 | GR | 16.05.2006 | ES | 26.05.2006 | PT | 17.07.2006 | GB | 29.09.2006 | IE | 29.09.2006 | LU | 29.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
DE | 16.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
GB | 29.09.2006 | ||
IE | 29.09.2006 | ||
LU | 29.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
DE | 16.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
GB | 29.09.2006 | ||
IE | 29.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
DE | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
GB | 29.09.2006 | ||
IE | 29.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
DE | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
IE | 29.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
DE | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
DE | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
DE | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.02.2006 | |
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3603484 (OGLE ROBERT W) [A] 1-20* column 3, line 1 - line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3856138 (MAEKAWA H, et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4410085 (BENEZIAT ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 68; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4756410 (HILDEBRANDT BODO [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 14; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US2631521 ; | [A]US2786769 (IRVING GREENSPAN); | [A]US3720524 (NAKAGAMI S); | [A]US4177938 (BRINA GUIDO J [US]); | [A]US4465183 (SAITO TADAO [JP], et al); | [A]US4682689 (PEREIRA JOSEPH J [US], et al); | [A]US4962853 (HILDEBRANDT BODO [DE]); | [A]US5209348 (SCHAFER III VERNON [US]); | [A]US5496575 (NEWARSKI EMIL [US]); | [A]US5676244 (GREEN ROBERT [US], et al) |