EP1224730 - FSK DEMODULATOR USING A FREQUENCY CONVERSION STAGE WITH THREE PARALLEL MIXERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Medtronic Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUBRICH, Gregory, J. 11190 Hillsboro Avenue N. Champlin, MN 55316 / US | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00967085.2 | 28.09.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000US26786 | Priority number, date | US19990415693 | 08.10.1999 Original published format: US 415693 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128085 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224730 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224730 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03D3/00 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
H04L27/1525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/21] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FSK DEMODULATOR UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES FREQUENZUMSETZERS MIT DREI PARALLEL GESCHALTETEN MISCHERN | [2002/30] | English: | FSK DEMODULATOR USING A FREQUENCY CONVERSION STAGE WITH THREE PARALLEL MIXERS | [2002/30] | French: | DEMODULATEUR FSK UTILISANT UN ETAGE CHANGEUR DE FREQUENCE AVEC TROIS MELANGEURS PARALLELES | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 26.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9840968 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 22 - page 5, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5179730 (LOPER ROGER K [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 40; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0344467 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]US4322851 (VANCE IAN A W) [A] 1 * figure 5 * |