EP1233855 - DEVICE FOR PRETREATING AND THEN PLASTIFYING OR AGGLOMERATING PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BACHER, Helmut Bruck/Hausleiten 17 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | For all designated states Schultz, Helmuth Badstrasse 20 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | For all designated states Wendelin, Georg Waldbothenweg 84 4033 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states BACHER, Helmut Bruck/Hausleiten 17 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | ||
For all designated states SCHULZ, Helmuth Badstrasse 20 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | |||
For all designated states WENDELIN, Georg Waldbothenweg 84 A-4033 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Wildhack, Helmut Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Wildhack, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing. Dr.Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 00967413.6 | 29.09.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000AT00258 | Priority number, date | AT19990002033 | 02.12.1999 Original published format: AT 203399 | [2002/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0139948 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233855 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233855 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00, B29C47/10 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
B29B17/0026 (EP,US);
B29B17/00 (KR);
B29C48/2888 (EP,US);
B29C48/397 (EP,US);
B29C48/53 (EP,US);
B29B2017/048 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VORBEHANDELN UND ANSCHLIESSENDEN PLASTIFIZIEREN ODER AGGLOMERIEREN VON KUNSTSTOFFEN | [2002/35] | English: | DEVICE FOR PRETREATING AND THEN PLASTIFYING OR AGGLOMERATING PLASTICS | [2002/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRETRAITER, PUIS DE PLASTIFIER OU D'AGGLOMERER DES MATIERES PLASTIQUES | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 29.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.09.2003 | FR | 03.09.2003 | GB | 03.09.2003 | IE | 03.09.2003 | NL | 03.09.2003 | CY | 29.09.2003 | LU | 29.09.2003 | BE | 30.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | DK | 03.12.2003 | GR | 03.12.2003 | SE | 03.12.2003 | ES | 14.12.2003 | PT | 03.02.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
GB | 03.09.2003 | ||
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
CY | 29.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
GB | 03.09.2003 | ||
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
CY | 29.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
GB | 03.09.2003 | ||
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
CY | 29.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
GB | 03.09.2003 | ||
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
CY | 29.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
CY | 29.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
CY | 29.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
CY | 29.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 03.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4222728 (BACHER HELMUT, et al) [A] 1-7* column W *; | [A]EP0123771 (EREMA [AT]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3525554 (PARACON EXTRUDERTECHNIK [AT]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9534418 (R H WRIDE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 1; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5988865 (BACHER HELMUT [AT], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |