EP1214128 - TERMINAL FOR TREATING FORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wincor Nixdorf International GmbH Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Wincor Nixdorf GmbH & Co KG Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAITZ, Günter Schwiegersteig 18 13629 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KAMIN, Hartmut Richard-Wagner-Strasse 50 10585 Berlin / DE | 03 /
BURCHART, Joachim Am Fichtenhain 14 33189 Schlangen / DE | [2002/25] | Application number, filing date | 00967570.3 | 13.09.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000DE03179 | Priority number, date | DE1999145834 | 24.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19945834 | [2002/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0124119 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1214128 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214128 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/06 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
A63F3/064 (EP,US);
G06F1/1601 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
G06F1/181 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1612 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/36] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | TERMINAL FÜR DIE BEARBEITUNG VON FORMULAREN | [2002/25] | English: | TERMINAL FOR TREATING FORMS | [2002/25] | French: | TERMINAL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE FORMULAIRES | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 04.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3741704 (KRAGE GABRIELE [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5156397 (VALENZA JR SAMUEL W [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2714752 (INT JEUX [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9841073 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5939694 (HOLCOMB GLEN [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |