EP1212825 - DRIVE FOR ADJUSTMENT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG, Coburg Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50 96450 Coburg / DE | [2008/11] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50 96450 Coburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SESSELMANN, Helmut Tröbach 17 D-96523 Steinach / DE | 02 /
FEDER, Roland Coburger Str. 13 D-96479 Weitramsdorf / DE | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Mathias Am Mühlberg 8 D-96145 Sesslach / DE | 04 /
STENZEL, Manfred Am Weidenurfer 31 D-96047 Bamberg / DE | [2002/36] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
SESSELMANN, Helmut Tröbach 17 D-96523 Steinach / DE | ||
02 /
FEDER, Roland Coburger Str. 13 D-96479 Weitramsdorf / DE | |||
03 /
HOFFMANN, Mathias Am Mühlenberg 8 D-96450 Coburg / DE | |||
04 /
STENZEL, Manfred Am Weidenurfer 31 D-96047 Bamberg / DE | Representative(s) | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00967595.0 | 14.09.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000DE03262 | Priority number, date | DE1999144915 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19944915 | [2002/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0120753 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212825 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212825 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1212825 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/116 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
E05F11/483 (EP,US);
E05F15/697 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
E05F11/505 (EP,US);
E05F15/60 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/72 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/268 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
F16H2001/2881 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ANTRIEB FÜR VERSTELLVORRICHTUNGEN IN KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | [2002/24] | English: | DRIVE FOR ADJUSTMENT DEVICES | [2002/24] | French: | MECANISME DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIFS DE REGLAGE DANS DES VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 27.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.01.2008 | IT | 23.01.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/04] | GB | 23.01.2008 | |
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | SE | 23.04.2008 | |
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 04.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3879623 (MIYAKE SHIUICHI) [A] * abstract *; | [A]DE4030489 (MAN GHH LOGISTICS [DE]) [A] * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5272938 (HSU CHI-HSUEH [TW], et al) [A] * figure 6 *; | [A]DE4412898 (ORLOWSKI BERNHARD DIPL ING [DE]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US5914159 (KATO MANABU [JP]) [A] * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 15 * * figures 1,2 * |