Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1216302
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.09.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
05.05.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.11.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
29.11.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
18.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.05.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
09.05.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
15.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|