EP1218640 - HIGH PRESSURE CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2003/20] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHARWAECHTER, Peter Sandweg 11 70199 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00967843.4 | 06.10.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000EP09819 | Priority number, date | DE1999148860 | 08.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19948860 | [2002/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0127476 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218640 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1218640 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/08, F04C3/00, F04C2/10, B08B3/02 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
F04C2/102 (EP);
B08B3/026 (EP);
F04C13/00 (EP);
F04C2/084 (EP);
B08B2203/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKREINIGUNGSGERÄT | [2002/27] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE CLEANING DEVICE | [2002/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE A HAUTE PRESSION | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 19.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.01.2003 | GR | 15.01.2003 | IE | 15.01.2003 | NL | 15.01.2003 | PT | 15.04.2003 | SE | 15.04.2003 | CY | 06.10.2003 | LU | 06.10.2003 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/36] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
CY | 06.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 15.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH09195004 ; | [A]JPH1180911 ; | [A]JPS5837162 ; | [A]JPH06336652 ; | [A]JPH01246343 ; | [A]GB1270122 (PLESSEY CO LTD) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [DY]DE19726794 (ELEKTRA BECKUM AG [DE]) [DY] 1-6 * figures 1-5; claim 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09195004 A 19970729 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11080911 A 19990326 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830521), vol. 007, no. 118, Database accession no. (C - 167), & JP58037162 A 19830304 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP06336652 A 19941206 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE & TECHNOL) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891225), vol. 013, no. 589, Database accession no. (C - 670), & JP01246343 A 19891002 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-3,5 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19726794 |