EP1221857 - FILLED BAKERY PRODUCT, MOULD AND METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magro, Jean-Paul Le Petit Moulinet 35490 Vieux Vy sur Couesnon / FR | [2003/05] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Sarl Mac Alan Village des Beaumettes 84220 Gordes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/34] | 01 /
MAGRO, Jean-Paul Le Petit Moulinet 35490 Vieux Vy sur Couesnon / FR | ||
Former [2002/29] | 01 /
MAGRO, Jean-Paul Lieu dit Font Caudette F-84220 Gordes / FR | Representative(s) | Debay, Yves, et al Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Debay, Yves, et al Cabinet Debay, 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | Application number, filing date | 00967961.4 | 06.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000FR02775 | Priority number, date | FR19990012993 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9912993 | [2002/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128345 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221857 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1221857 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A21D13/00, A21D8/06, A21B3/13 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
A21D8/06 (EP);
A21B3/13 (EP);
A21D13/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÜLLTES BACKWARENERZEUGNIS, BACKFORM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2002/29] | English: | FILLED BAKERY PRODUCT, MOULD AND METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [2002/29] | French: | PRODUIT DE BOULANGERIE FOURRE, MOULE ET PROCEDE POUR SA PREPARATION | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2006 | CY | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | IE | 17.05.2006 | IT | 17.05.2006 | NL | 17.05.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | ES | 28.08.2006 | LU | 06.10.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | CH | 31.10.2006 | LI | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
LU | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 17.08.2006 | |
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3518091 (TURNER WESLEY) [X] 1,3,4,8-10 * column 3, lines 1-11 * * column 3, lines 66-75 * * column 4, line 72 - column 5, line 10 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 1-3,7 * [Y] 10-12; | [XA]FR2516353 (LOCOLAS CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1,10 * page 3, lines 4-14 * * claims 1,2,7 * [A] 8,9; | [X]FR2573628 (LOCOLAS CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 2, lines 8-15 * * page 9, lines 26-32 * * claims 1,10 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO8803757 (WALLIKER GRAEME IAN KENDALL [AU]) [X] 1,8-10 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 11 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 13 * * page 4, lines 22-30 * * claims 1,2,5 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]DE4117093 (NOCKEMANN OTTO [DE]) [Y] 10-12 * column 2, lines 49-55 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 51 * * claim 1 * * figures 4-6 *; | [X]GB2289431 (ASPERRY LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,8-10 * figure 2 * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 12 * * page 5, lines 30-32 * * page 7, lines 6-18 * * page 8, lines 14-24 * * claims 1,9,12,14 *; | [X]WO9814063 (SCORPIO INNOVATIONS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,4,8-10 * page 1, lines 7-27 * * page 3, lines 8-28 * * page 4, lines 14,15 * * claims 1,20 * * figures 3,4 *; | [PX]FR2790644 (BRAS MICHEL [FR]) [PX] 1,3,4,8,10 * page 3, lines 21-36 * * page 5, lines 14-17 * * page 6, lines 18-23 * * page 7, lines 21-31 * * claims 1-3,5,10 ** figures 1A,B * |