EP1229801 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPOSITE ICED CONFECTIONERY ITEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARS, INCORPORATED 6885 Elm Street McLean Virginia 22101-3883 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Mars, Incorporated 6885 Elm Street McLean, Virginia 22101-3883 / US | ||
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Mars Incorporated 6885 Elm Street McLean, Virginia 22101-3883 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLADIN, Alain 53, rue Ferme Falk F-67500 Haguenau / FR | 02 /
PICQUET, Alain 9, rue des Pigeons F-67200 Strasbourg / FR | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Cabinet Hirsch 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00968018.2 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000FR02839 | Priority number, date | FR19990012886 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9912886 | [2002/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128352 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229801 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1229801 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/28, A23G9/14, A23G9/08, A23G3/20 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
A23G9/083 (EP);
A23G9/282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/40] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOMPOSITEISKONFEKT | [2002/33] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPOSITE ICED CONFECTIONERY ITEM | [2002/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE CONFISERIE GLACEE COMPOSITE | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1711750 (W C SCHOPPNER) [X] 1,5,6,8-15 * page 4, line 51 - line 60; figure .; claim - *; | [X]US2850990 (M B RASMUSSON) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4517205 (ALDRICH DEBORAH G) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9402027 (UNILEVER PLC ;UNILEVER NV (NL)) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 18 - line 21; figure -; claims 1,10 *; | [X]US5911813 (JENSEN ERIK HVIID) [X] 1 * figures 11,14,,9,10,12,13; claim - *; | [A]JPS5658459 ; | [X]US4229484 (STEELS GORDON ET AL) [X] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4666723 (INVERNIZZI RUTILIO ET AL) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0130748 (NABISCO BRANDS INC) [A] * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3072078 (H A FAERBER) [A] 1 * figure 5; claim - *; | [A]US1465749 (F. WESTERMAN); | [A]US1404548 (F. G. SALERNO); | [A]US4388795 (STOHLQUIST ROGER H ET AL) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810804), vol. 005, no. 120, Database accession no. (C - 065), & JP56058459 A 19810521 (ARAKI MASAMI) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |