EP1222014 - METHOD FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/29] | REACTOR FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF GASES | ||
[2004/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accentus Plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Accentus plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAYBONE, David 1 Talbot Cottages Fosse Way Stow-on-the-Wold Gloucester GL54 1DW / GB | 02 /
SHAWCROSS, James, Timothy 27 Ticknell Piece Road Charlbury Oxforshire OX7 3TN / GB | 03 /
THOMAS, Suzanne, Elizabeth 11 Priory House Priory Road Kenilworth Warwickshire CZ8 1LN / GB | 04 /
MARTIN, Anthony, Robert 17 Hamble Drive Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3TF / GB | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Clare Josephine, et al Coller IP Management Fugro House Hithercroft Road Wallingford Oxfordshire OX10 9RB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Clare Josephine, et al Accentus plc Patents Department 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxon OX11 0QJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/29] | Lofting, Marcus John Accentus plc, Patents Department, 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire, OX11 0QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00968095.0 | 16.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000GB03943 | Priority number, date | GB19990024999 | 22.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9924999 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0130485 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222014 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222014 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/32, F01N3/08, F01N3/01, F01N3/027 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
B01D53/0446 (EP,US);
B01D53/32 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/088 (EP,US);
F01N3/01 (EP,US);
F01N3/0275 (EP,US);
F01N3/0807 (EP,US);
F01N3/0835 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N3/085 (EP,US);
F01N3/0871 (EP,US);
F01N3/0892 (EP,US);
B01D2253/104 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/202 (EP,US);
B01D2253/342 (EP,US);
B01D2253/3425 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/104 (EP,US);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D53/0454 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0809 (EP,US);
B01J2219/083 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0845 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0875 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR ABGASPLASMABEHANDLUNG | [2004/03] | English: | METHOD FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF GASES | [2004/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA DE GAZ | [2004/03] |
Former [2002/29] | REAKTOR FÜR ABGASPLASMABEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [2002/29] | REACTOR FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF GASES | ||
Former [2002/29] | REACTEUR DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA DE GAZ | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2004 | BE | 02.06.2004 | CH | 02.06.2004 | CY | 02.06.2004 | FI | 02.06.2004 | LI | 02.06.2004 | NL | 02.06.2004 | DK | 02.09.2004 | GR | 02.09.2004 | SE | 02.09.2004 | LU | 16.10.2004 | ES | 18.10.2004 | IE | 18.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | PT | 02.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
CY | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
LU | 16.10.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/33] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
LI | 02.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11114351 ; | [A]JPH11114359 ; | [A]US5715677 (WALLMAN P HENRIK [US], et al) [A] 1,14,20-22 * abstract *; | [X]US5746984 (HOARD JOHN W [US]) [X] 1-6,8-16,18,19 * column 5, line 53 - column 8, line 61; figures 1-4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11114351 A 19990427 (SANDENSHA:KK;YAMAMOTO TOSHIAKI; YOU SADAYOSHI) [X] 1,13,14,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11114359 A 19990427 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE &TECHNOL) [A] * abstract * | Examination | JPH06106025 | EP0605237 | by applicant | US3983021 | US5147516 | US5254231 | GB2274412 | WO9912638 |