EP1210532 - GEARING FOR POWER SHARING IN PLANETARY TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harrier Technologies, Inc. 280 Railroad Avenue Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | [2009/04] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Harrier Technologies, Inc. 140 Greenwich Avenue Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORROW, William, Bruce 549 La Marina Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Bucks, Teresa Anne, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Bucks, Teresa Anne, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00968311.1 | 10.08.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000US18792 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0131231 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1210532 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1210532 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H37/14, F16H57/08 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
F16H1/2818 (EP);
F16H1/2845 (EP);
F16H1/46 (EP);
F16H2001/289 (EP);
F16H57/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANETENGETRIEBE MIT LASTAUSGLEICH | [2002/23] | English: | GEARING FOR POWER SHARING IN PLANETARY TRANSMISSION | [2002/23] | French: | TRAIN D'ENGRENAGES A REPARTITION DE PUISSANCE DANS UNE TRANSMISSION PLANETAIRE | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 23.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 26.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1425430 (RAGNAR WIKANDER OSCAR) [A] 1,5* abstract *; | [A]DE1157049 (E H WILHELM G STOECKICHT DR IN) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [X]GB983625 (CESKOSLOVENSKE ZD Y NAFTOVYCH, et al) [X] 9-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US3459072 (SHANNON JAMES FORREST) [X] 9-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4391163 (BENTHAKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4216399 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US5472383 (MCKIBBIN ALBERT H [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5472383 (MCKIBBIN ALBERT H [US]); | [A]US813461 (STACKS HOWARD ROY [US]); | [A]US1399549 (GUSTAVE FAST); | [A]US1425430 (RAGNAR WIKANDER OSCAR); | [A]US3245279 (BAKER STANLEY W); | [A]US3592078 (STARK RICHARD); | [A]US4391163 (BENTHAKE HEINZ [DE], et al); | [A]US4869139 (GOTMAN ALEXANDER S [US]) |