EP1234452 - DYNAMIC VISUAL REGISTRATION OF A 3-D OBJECT WITH A GRAPHICAL MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Scientific Licensing LLC 1049 Camino Dos Rios, P.O. Box 1085, Mail Code A15 Thousand Oaks California 91358-0085 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Rockwell Scientific Licensing LLC 1049 Camino Dos Rios, P.O. Box 1085, Mail Code A15 Thousand Oaks, California 91358-0085 / US | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Innovative Technology Licensing, LLC 1049 Camino Dos Rios, P.O. Box 1085, Mail Code A15 Thousand Oaks, California 91358-0085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDARESWARAN, Venkataraman 820 Vista Arriago Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | 02 /
BEHRINGER, Reinhold, Werner 888 St. Charles Drive 1 Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00968538.9 | 29.09.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000US27039 | Priority number, date | US19990407928 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: US 407928 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0124536 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1234452 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234452 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
G06T3/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/33 (EP,US);
G06T7/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE OPTISCHE REGISTRIERUNG EINES 3D OBJEKTES MIT EINEM GRAFISCHEN MODEL | [2007/52] | English: | DYNAMIC VISUAL REGISTRATION OF A 3-D OBJECT WITH A GRAPHICAL MODEL | [2002/35] | French: | ALIGNEMENT VISUEL DYNAMIQUE D'UN OBJET EN 3-D AVEC UN MODELE GRAPHIQUE | [2002/35] |
Former [2002/35] | DYNAMISCHE OPTISCHE REGISTRIERUNG VON EINEM 3D OBJEKTES MIT EINEM GRAFISCHEN MODEL | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 30.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0462289 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [X]US5412569 (CORBY JR NELSON R [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 7 * * column 5, line 41 - line 68 * * column A; figure - * |