EP1220887 - PROTEIN-CONTAINING GRANULES AND GRANULE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2002/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHANI, Mahmood, M. 519 Vista Ridge Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00968909.2 | 10.10.2000 | [2002/28] | WO2000US27888 | Priority number, date | US19990419391 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 419391 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129170 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1220887 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1220887 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D3/38, C11D3/22, C11D3/12, C11D3/386, C12N9/98 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
C11D3/1213 (EP);
C11D17/0039 (EP);
C11D3/1253 (EP);
C11D3/22 (EP);
C11D3/222 (EP);
C11D3/38672 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/49] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTEINHALTIGE KÖRNCHEN UND GRANULATFORMULIERUNGEN | [2002/28] | English: | PROTEIN-CONTAINING GRANULES AND GRANULE FORMULATIONS | [2002/28] | French: | GRANULE CONTENANT DES PROTEINES ET FORMULATIONS DE GRANULES | [2002/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 17.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05026512.3 / EP1632561 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.12.2005 | CY | 07.12.2005 | LI | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.03.2006 | SE | 07.03.2006 | PT | 08.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/50] | CH | 07.12.2005 | |
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | CH | 07.12.2005 | |
IT | 07.12.2005 | ||
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CH | 07.12.2005 | |
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CH | 07.12.2005 | |
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 07.12.2005 | |
LI | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 07.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [AX]EP0277532 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1-9,21-23,25-28,37 * example -; claim - * * page 4, line 21 - line 32 * [X] 24; | [X]EP0304331 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [X] 1,4-13 * example 11 *; | [X]WO8908694 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-14,21-23,30-32,37* example 10; claims 1,10 *; | [X]EP0415652 (CLOROX CO [US]) [X] 24 * example 11; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9739116 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-31 * examples 3,9 *; | [X]US5739091 (KIESSER TORSTEN W [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-14,16,17,21-23 * examples 1-5,7; claim - *; | [DX]WO9932613 (GENENCOR INT [US]) [DX] 1,4,7-12,19-23,30,35-37 * examples 1-10; claims 1-56 * |