blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1216047

EP1216047 - COMBINATION OF LOTEPREDNOL AND BETA2-ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS AND ITS USE BY INHALATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF BRONCHIAL ASTHMA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/26]NOVEL COMBINATION OF LOTEPREDNOL AND BETA2-ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS
[2005/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIATRIS GmbH & Co. KG
Benzstrasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
[2005/18]
Former [2002/26]For all designated states
VIATRIS GmbH & Co. KG
Weismüllerstrasse 45
60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SZELENYI, Istvan
Händelstrasse 32
90571 Schwaig / DE
02 / POPPE, Hildegard
Kieler Strasse 6
01109 Dresden / DE
03 / HEER, Sabine
Lindenauer Strasse 13
01445 Radebeul / DE
04 / ENGEL, Jürgen
Erlenweg 3
63755 Alzenau / DE
 [2002/26]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2003/51]
Former [2002/26]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00969304.526.09.2000
[2002/26]
WO2000EP09392
Priority number, dateDE199914723530.09.1999         Original published format: DE 19947235
[2002/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0122956
Date:05.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/14]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1216047
Date:26.06.2002
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1216047
Date:12.10.2005
Language:DE
[2005/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/57, A61K31/165, A61K31/56, A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61K31/167, A61K9/12, A61K31/522, A61K31/135
[2005/14]
CPC:
A61K9/0075 (EP,US); A61K31/167 (EP,US); A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US); A61P11/00 (EP); A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP); A61P25/02 (EP); A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/56, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
Former IPC [2002/26]A61K31/57, A61K31/165, A61K31/56, A61P11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/26]
TitleGerman:KOMBINATION VON LOTEPREDNOL UND BETA2-ADRENOZEPTOR-AGONISTEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG DURCH INHALATION ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ASTHMA BRONCHIALE[2005/14]
English:COMBINATION OF LOTEPREDNOL AND BETA2-ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS AND ITS USE BY INHALATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF BRONCHIAL ASTHMA[2005/14]
French:ASSOCIATION DE LOTEPREDNOL ET D'AGONISTES DE L'ADRENOCEPTEUR BETA2 ET SON UTILISATION PAR INHALATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ASTHME BRONCHIQUE[2005/14]
Former [2002/26]NEUE KOMBINATION VON LOTEPREDNOL UND BETA2-ADRENOZEPTOR-AGONISTEN
Former [2002/26]NOVEL COMBINATION OF LOTEPREDNOL AND BETA2-ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS
Former [2002/26]NOUVELLE ASSOCIATION DE LOTEPREDNOL ET D'AGONISTES DE L'ADRENOCEPTEUR BETA2
Entry into regional phase28.02.2002National basic fee paid 
28.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
15.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2005Fee for grant paid
27.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US5830490  (WEINSTEIN ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,3 *;
 [PX]WO0028979  (SKYEPHARMA AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-6 * claims 1,7,8,14,15 ** page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 20 *;
 [X]  - L.BJERMER, L.LARSSON, "Long-acting beta-2-agonists: how are they used in an optimal way?", RESPIRATORY MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 91, no. 10, pages 587 - 591, XP000992766 [X] 1,4 * page 587 * * page 588 * * page 590, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0954-6111(97)90004-4
 [X]  - T. VAN DER MOLEN E.A., "Effects of the long acting beta agonist formoterol on asthma control in asthmatic patients using inhaled corticosteroids", THORAX, (1997), vol. 52, no. 6, pages 535 - 539, XP000992767 [X] 1,4 * page 535 * * page 537 * * page 538, column 2 * * page 539, column 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.