18.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
29.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
20.06.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
22.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
15.02.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
13.07.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] |
11.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.03.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
31.05.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
31.05.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
27.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|