Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020050242 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | FI0000879 | 12.10.2000 | FI19992210 | 13.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5059268B | Global Dossier | 24.10.2012 | B2 | JP2003511955 | 25.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | FI0000879 | 12.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU770577B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2004 | B2 | AU7925200 | 23.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | FI0000879 | 12.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1222748 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2007 | B1 | EP1222748 | 17.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | FI0000879 | 12.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2385111 | 16.02.2010 | C | CA2385111 | 19.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | FI0000879 | 12.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60036010T | 15.05.2008 | T2 | DE60036010D1 | 27.09.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | FI0000879 | 12.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0128116 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE370555T | 15.09.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI114887B | 14.01.2005 | B | FI20002154 | 14.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6909739 | 21.06.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FI992210 | 13.10.1999 | FI20002154 | 29.09.2000 |