EP1222748 - SIGNAL ACQUISITION SYSTEM FOR SPREAD SPECTRUM RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U-NAV Microelectronics Corporation 15255 Alton Parkway, Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2007/33] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states U-NAV Microelectronics Corporation 15255 Alton Parkway, Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EEROLA, Ville Aukustintie 2-4 B 4 FIN-39160 Julkujärvi / FI | 02 /
RITONIEMI, Tapani Ville Ritolan tie 168 FIN-61100 Peräseinäjoki / FI | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2002/29] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani Kolster Oy Ab,P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00969580.0 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000FI00879 | Priority number, date | FI19990002210 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: FI 992210 | FI20000002154 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: FI 20002154 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128116 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222748 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222748 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
H04B1/708 (EP,US);
H04B1/7093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR SIGNALERFASSUNG FÜR EINEN SPREIZSPEKTRUMEMPFÄNGER | [2002/29] | English: | SIGNAL ACQUISITION SYSTEM FOR SPREAD SPECTRUM RECEIVER | [2002/29] | French: | SYSTEME D'ACQUISITION DE SIGNAUX POUR RECEPTEUR A SPECTRE ETALE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 27.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2007 | BE | 15.08.2007 | CH | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | LI | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | IE | 12.10.2007 | LU | 12.10.2007 | FR | 31.10.2007 | IT | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | ES | 26.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 12.10.2007 | ||
LU | 12.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 12.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 12.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 12.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 15.08.2007 | |
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 26.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0772305 (YOZAN INC [JP], et al); | [A]EP0874471 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]EP0886386 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0924871 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0944178 (SONY CORP [JP]) |