EP1221988 - SUTURE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2006/13] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US | ||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states GILTECH LIMITED 9/12 North Harbour Estate Ayr KA8 8BN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEALY, David Michael Midton House, By Alloway Ayr KA7 4EG / GB | 02 /
GILCHRIST, Thomas 67 Midton Road Ayr KA7 2TW / GB | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2002/29] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd and Company, 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00969699.8 | 20.10.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000GB04049 | Priority number, date | GB19990024694 | 20.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9924694 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128601 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221988 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1221988 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61L17/00, A61B17/06 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
A61L17/005 (EP);
A61B17/06166 (EP);
A61L2300/102 (EP);
A61L2300/104 (EP);
A61L2300/404 (EP);
A61L2300/602 (EP);
A61L2300/606 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES NÄHMATERIAL | [2002/29] | English: | SUTURE MATERIAL | [2002/29] | French: | MATERIEL DE SUTURE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2006 | BE | 29.03.2006 | CH | 29.03.2006 | CY | 29.03.2006 | FI | 29.03.2006 | LI | 29.03.2006 | NL | 29.03.2006 | DK | 29.06.2006 | SE | 29.06.2006 | GR | 30.06.2006 | PT | 29.08.2006 | LU | 20.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
LU | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 29.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0328421 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0633032 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5413788 (EDWARDS NEIL [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,6-13,21 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-15 * * column 3, lines 40-63 * * column 5, lines 44-51 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 31 *; | [X]US5534288 (GRUSKIN ELLIOTT A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-11* the whole document *; | [X]US5744151 (CAPELLI CHRISTOPHER C [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 1, lines 10-15; example 22 * |