07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
15.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
04.06.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
22.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
26.06.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
24.04.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
25.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.11.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2008 |
First examination report |
|
28.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2004 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.07.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
01.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.08.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
14.06.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] |
14.06.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] |
13.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
07.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|