EP1227075 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING AND RECOVERING DIMETHYL TEREPHTHALATE AND ETHYLENE GLYCOL FROM POLYESTER WASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2009/22] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIHARA, Kenichi, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Kenji, c/o Teijin Limited 1-1, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
MIYAMOTO, Masanori, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | 04 /
NAKASHIMA, Minoru, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | 05 /
SATO, Kazuhiro, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | 06 /
HASEGAWA, Hideo, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
ISHIHARA, Kenichi, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIDA, Kenji, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAMOTO, Masanori, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKASHIMA, Minoru, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | |||
05 /
SATO, Kazuhiro, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | |||
06 /
HASEGAWA, Hideo, c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8041 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00969909.1 | 19.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000JP07289 | Priority number, date | JP19990300619 | 22.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30061999 | JP19990364479 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36447999 | JP19990364480 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36448099 | [2002/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0130729 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227075 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227075 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C27/02, C07C67/03, C07C29/128 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
C07C67/03 (EP,US);
C07C27/00 (KR);
C07C29/1285 (EP,US);
C08G63/183 (EP,US);
C08J11/24 (EP,US);
C09D167/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/1285, C07C31/202 (US,EP);
C07C67/03, C07C69/82 (EP,US);
C09D167/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | C07C27/02, C07C29/128, C07C31/20, C07C69/82, C07C67/03, C08J11/10, C08L67/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG UND RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON DIMETHYLTEREPHTHALAT UND ETHYLENGLYKOL AUS POLYESTERABFÄLLEN | [2002/31] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATING AND RECOVERING DIMETHYL TEREPHTHALATE AND ETHYLENE GLYCOL FROM POLYESTER WASTE | [2002/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION ET DE RECUPERATION DE DIMETHYLTEREPHTHALATE ET D'ETHYLENE GLYCOL DE RESIDUS DE POLYESTER | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2002 | Translation filed | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.2009 | BE | 29.07.2009 | CY | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | IE | 19.10.2009 | LU | 19.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | ES | 09.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 19.10.2009 | ||
LU | 19.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 19.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1296785 (INVENTA AG.) [X] 14 * claim - * * page 2, line 79 - line 85 *; | [A]US3907868 (CURRIE ROBERT MARION, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5236959 (OAKLEY ETHERIDGE O [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US5504121 (WEST SIMON M [AU]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0723951 (ARS ING S R L [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19646378 (BROWN JOHN DEUTSCHE ENG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS432088B ; | [A]JPH07309809 (TEIJIN LTD); | [AP]JP2000169623 (IS KK) |