EP1230797 - METHOD FOR ENHANCING VIDEO COMPRESSION THROUGH AUTOMATIC DATA ANALYSIS AND PROFILE SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moonlight Cordless Ltd. Hanna Senesh Street 22 51589 Bnei Brak / IL | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DVIR, Ira Shenkin Street 39 65232 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
MEDAN, Yoav Hankin Road 25 32762 Haifa / IL | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 00970485.9 | 20.10.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000US26268 | Priority number, date | US19990438500 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: US 438500 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0137564 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230797 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14, H04N7/26 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
H04N21/4363 (EP,US);
H04N19/12 (EP,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/162 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/196 (EP,US);
H04N19/42 (EP,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,US);
H04N19/57 (EP,US);
H04N19/577 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/4143 (EP,US);
H04N21/4398 (EP,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/4402 (EP,US);
H04N21/485 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON VIDEOKOMPRESSION DURCH AUROMATISCHE DATENANALYSE UND PROFILAUSWAHL | [2002/33] | English: | METHOD FOR ENHANCING VIDEO COMPRESSION THROUGH AUTOMATIC DATA ANALYSIS AND PROFILE SELECTION | [2002/33] | French: | PROCEDE D'AMELIORATION DE LA COMPRESSION VIDEO GRACE A L'ANALYSE DE DONNEES AUTOMATIQUE ET LA SELECTION DE PROFIL | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 02.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/45] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5530661 (GARBE OLIVIER [US], et al); | [Y]US5838996 (DECARMO LINDEN A [US]); | [Y]US5915067 (NONOMURA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) |