EP1232639 - PERSONALIZED ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grape Technology Group, Inc. 3864 Courtney Street Suite 411 Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Grape Technology Group, Inc. 3864 Courtney street, Suite 411 Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Quixi, Inc. 40 West 25th Street, 6th Floor New York, NY 10010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARWELL, Evan 23 West 12th Street New York, NY 10011 / US | 02 /
PINES, Robert 136 E. 79th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/34] | 01 /
MARWELL, Evan 15 W. 17th Street, Apt. 8 New York, NY 10011 / US | ||
02 /
PINES, Robert 136 E. 79th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | Representative(s) | Lenne, Laurence, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Lenne, Laurence, et al Cabinet Feray-Lenne 44/52, rue de la Justice F-75020 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00970553.4 | 03.10.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000US27275 | Priority number, date | US19990158311P | 08.10.1999 Original published format: US 158311 P | US19990449126 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: US 449126 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128208 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232639 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04M3/523, H04M7/00 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
H04M3/432 (EP,US);
H04M3/4931 (EP,US);
H04M3/51 (EP,US);
H04M3/5108 (EP,US);
H04M2203/105 (EP,US);
H04M2203/1058 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US);
H04M2242/22 (EP,US);
H04M3/12 (EP,US);
H04M3/42059 (EP,US);
H04M3/42161 (EP,US);
H04M3/44 (EP,US);
H04M3/4933 (EP,US);
H04M3/4935 (EP,US);
H04M7/06 (EP,US);
H04M7/12 (EP,US);
H04Q3/72 (EP,US);
Y10S379/90 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/34] | Extension states | AL | 24.04.2002 | LT | 24.04.2002 | LV | 24.04.2002 | MK | 24.04.2002 | RO | 24.04.2002 | SI | 24.04.2002 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INDIVIDUELLEN UNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2002/34] | English: | PERSONALIZED ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2002/34] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ASSISTANCE PERSONNALISEE | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 04.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2006 | 31.10.2014 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 15.12.2004 | [2005/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0823809 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15,22,43 * abstract *; | [XY]WO9813992 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 16-21,23-42,44-53 * page 3, line 23 - line l * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 19 * [Y] 1-15,22,43; | [Y]CA2232075 (METRO ONE TELECOMMUNICATIONS [US]) [Y] 1-15,22,43 * page 7, line 28 - line 30 * * page 15, line 10 - line 18 *; | [I]WO9935806 (ALCATEL USA INC [US]) [I] 16-21,23-42,44-53* abstract *; | [XY]WO9951012 (TELIA AB [SE]) [X] 16-21,23-42,44-53 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 7, line 7 * [Y] 1-15,22,43 | International search | [Y]US5652789 (MINER RICHARD A [US], et al); | [Y]US5943417 (COX PATRICK M [US], et al); | [YP]US6000031 (BINGAMAN KEITH B [US], et al) |