EP1218393 - CELL TARGETING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3700 Market Street, Suite 300 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA 3700 Market Street, Suite 300 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINER, David, B. 717 Beacom Lane Merion Station, PA 19066 / US | 02 /
KIM, Jong, J. 157 Orchard Drive North Wales, PA 19454 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Donghui 4730 Pine Street, Apartment B3 Philadelphia, PA 19143 / US | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00970611.0 | 06.10.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000US27618 | Priority number, date | US19990157871P | 06.10.1999 Original published format: US 157871 P | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0124764 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218393 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/16, C12N15/86, A61K39/00, C07K14/705 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/21 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61K2039/5152 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5156 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | C07H21/02, C07H21/04, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Title | German: | ZELLGERICHTETE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODEN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2002/27] | English: | CELL TARGETING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2002/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CIBLAGE DE CELLULES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CELLES-CI | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2008 | 13.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 16.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Appeal following examination | 06.04.2009 | Appeal received No. T1453/09 | 08.06.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.10.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2012 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9610419 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US]); | [PX]WO9957295 (SCHERING PLOUGH LTD [CH], et al); | International search | [A]US5814482 (DUBENSKY JR THOMAS W [US], et al); |