EP1240222 - LATEX FORMATION IN ALKALINE REACTIVE MEDIUM AND THEIR APPLICATIONS IN FORMING POLYESTER BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Mahendra, Kumar 2600 Brighton Court Kingsport, TN 37660-4762 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Linda, Jane 1816 Hermitage Drive Kingsport, TN 37664-3206 / US | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00970703.5 | 10.10.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000US27914 | Priority number, date | US19990159044P | 12.10.1999 Original published format: US 159044 P | US20000668449 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: US 668449 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0127177 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240222 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/04, C08F2/12, C08J3/02 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
C08J3/095 (EP,US);
C08F273/00 (EP,US);
C08F283/00 (EP,US);
C08F283/04 (EP,US);
C08J3/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LATEXHERSTELLUNG IN EINEM ALKALISCHEN REAKTIVEN MITTEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYESTERMISCHUNGEN | [2002/38] | English: | LATEX FORMATION IN ALKALINE REACTIVE MEDIUM AND THEIR APPLICATIONS IN FORMING POLYESTER BLENDS | [2002/38] | French: | PREPARATION DE LATEX EN MILIEU REACTIF ALCALIN ET LEURS APPLICATIONS DANS LA FORMATION DE MELANGES DE POLYESTERS | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 24.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/45] | 04.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9947578 (REICHHOLD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 3, line 7 - line 14 * * page 13, line 30 - page 14, line 14 * * page 18, line 19 - line 21; claims 4,9,18 *; | [X]WO9728199 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 3, line 35 - line 38 * * page 15, line 29 - page 16, line 6; example -; claim 1 *; | [PX]EP0982351 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1 * page 3, line 35 - line 38 * * page 3, line 53 - line 56; claim 1 *; | [X]US4368287 (ISHIKURA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US5277978 (FEUSTEL DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4791151 (KOWALSKI ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 18-32 * the whole document * |