EP1240323 - REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING AND MODULATING EXPRESSION OF GENES REGULATED BY CDK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 352 Henry Administration Building, 506 South Wright Street Urbana, Illinois 61801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Bey-Dih 1116 Cambria Lane Lombard, IL 60148 / US | 02 /
RONINSON, Igor, B. 2731 Lincoln Lane Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00970780.3 | 11.10.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000US28082 | Priority number, date | US19990449589 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: US 449589 | WO2000US09286 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/09286 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0138532 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1240323 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, G01N33/68 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/4738 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AGENZIEN UND METHODEN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ZUR MODULIERUNG DER GENEXPRESSION, VON GENEN DIE DURCH CDK REGULIERT WERDEN | [2002/38] | English: | REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING AND MODULATING EXPRESSION OF GENES REGULATED BY CDK INHIBITORS | [2002/38] | French: | REACTIFS ET PROCEDES D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE MODULATION DE L'EXPRESSION DE GENES REGULES PAR LES INHIBITEURS DE CDK | [2002/38] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Divisional application(s) | EP06018016.3 / EP1734120 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO0061751 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [E] 1-14,16,18-20,22,24-39,41,42,44-94,96-109,111-155,170,171,173-177,179-198,200-224 * the whole document *; | [X] - B.-D. CHANG ET AL., "Transient overexpression of p21 WAF1/CIP1 induces cell death and features of senescence in a human fibrosarcoma line.", PROCEEDING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, (199903), vol. 40, pages 94 - 95, XP000914903 [X] 1-14,16,18-20,22,24-39,41,42,44-94,96-109,111-155,170,171,200-224 * the whole document * | [XY] - H. XIAO ET AL., "Sodium butyrate induces NIH3T3 cells to senescence-like state and enhances promoter activity of p21 waf/CIP1 in p53-independent manner.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), vol. 237, pages 457 - 460, XP000914900 [X] 175,211,214 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14,16,18-20,22,24-39,41,42,44-94,96-105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1997.7158 | [XY] - M. HSIAO ET AL., "Functional expression of human p21 WAF1/CIP1 gene in rat glioma cells suppresses tumor growth in vivo and induces radiosensitivity.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), vol. 233, pages 329 - 335, XP000914899 [X] 175 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14,16,18-20,22,24-39,41,42,44-94,96-109,111-155,183-198,200-210,214-224 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1997.6450 | [Y] - M. VOGT ET AL., "Independent induction of senescence by p16INK4a and p21CIP1 in spontaneously immortalized human fibroblasts.", CELL GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION, (199802), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 139 - 146, XP000923096 [Y] 1-14,16,18-20,22,24-39,41,42,44-94,96-109,111-155,183-198,200-210,214-224 * the whole document * | [Y] - ZENG Y.-X. ET AL, "Regulation of p21(WAF1/CIP1) expression by p53-independent pathways.", ONCOGENE, (1996) 12/7 (1557-1564)., XP000922595 [Y] 12-14,16,18-20,22,24-26,38,39,41,42,44-51,92-94,96-105,179-181 * the whole document * | [Y] - AFSHARI C.A. ET AL, "A role for a p21-E2F interaction during senescence arrest of normal human fibroblasts.", CELL GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION, (1996) 7/8 (979-988)., XP000922599 [Y] 52-91,107-109,111-123,186-198,200-210 * the whole document * | [Y] - M. JOHNSON ET AL., "Evidence for a p53-independent pathway for upregulation of SDI1/CIP1/WAF1/p21 RNA in human cells.", MOLECULAR CARCINOGENESIS, (199410), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 59 - 64, XP000922631 [Y] 179-181 * the whole document * | [PX] - CHANG B.-D. ET AL, "Role of p53 and p21(waf1/cip1) in senescence -like terminal proliferation arrest induced in human tumor cells by chemotherapeutic drugs.", ONCOGENE, (26 AUG 1999) 18/34, page 4808-4818, XP000922555 [PX] 1-14,16,18-20,22,24-39,41,42,44-94,96-109,111-155,170,171,200-224 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1203078 | [A] - M. NAKANISHI ET AL., "The C-terminal region of p21 SDI1/WAF1/CIP1 is involved in proliferating cell nuclear antigen binding but does not appear to be required for growth inhibition.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19950721), vol. 270, no. 29, pages 17060 - 17063, XP000914898 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.32.18875 | [A] - M. NAKANISHI ET AL., "Identification of the active region of the DNA synthesis inhibitory gene p21 Sdi1/CIP1/WAF1", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 555 - 563, XP002039812 [A] * the whole document * | [PX] - B.-D. CHANG ET AL., "Effects of p21 Waf1/Cip1/Sdi1 on cellular gene expression: Implications for carcinogenesis, senescence, and age-related diseases.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20000411), vol. 97, no. 8, pages 4291 - 4296, XP000921392 [PX] 1-14,16,18-20,22,24-39,41,42,44-94,96-109,111-155,170,171,173-177,179-198,200-224 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.8.4291 | [PX] - B.-D. CHANG ET AL., "p21 Waf1/Cip1/Sdi1 - induced growth arrest is associated with depletion of mitosis-control proteins and leads to abnormal mitosis and endoreduplication in recovering cells.", ONCOGENE, (20000420), vol. 19, no. 17, pages 2165 - 2170, XP000922527 [PX] 1-14,16,18-20,22,24-39,41,42,44-94,96-109,111-155,170,171,173-177,179-198,200-224 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1203573 | [XY] - REZNIKOFF C.A. ET AL, "Elevated p16 at senescence and loss of p16 at immortalization i human papillomavirus 16 E6, but not E7, transformed human uroepithelial cells.", CANCER RESEARCH (1996) 56/13 (2886-2890)., XP000993535 [X] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 | [XY] - TANIGUCHI K. ET AL, "Induction of the p16(INK4a) senescence gene as a new therapeuti strategy for the treatment of rheumatoid arthritis.", NATURE MEDICINE, (1999) 5/7 (760-767)., XP000993540 [X] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/10480 | [XY] - D.A. ALCORTA ET AL., "Involvement of the cyclin-dependent kinase inhibitor p16 (INK4a) in replicative senescence of normal human fibroblasts", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199611), vol. 93, pages 13742 - 13747, XP001003075 [X] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.24.13742 | [XY] - L. UHRBOM ET AL., "Induction of senescence in human malignant glioma cells by p16INK4a", ONCOGENE, (19970731), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 505 - 514, XP000994730 [X] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1201227 | [XY] - A.J. BRENNER ET AL., "Increased p16 expression with first senescence arrest in human mammary epithelial cells and extended growth capacity with p16 inactivation.", ONCOGENE, (19980716), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 199 - 205, XP000994736 [X] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1201919 | [XY] - D.F. JARRARD ET AL., "p16/pRb pathway alterations are required for bypassing senescence in human prostate epithelial cells.", CANCER RESEARCH, (19990615), vol. 59, pages 2957 - 2964, XP000993538 [X] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 | [Y] - S.J. KUERBITZ ET AL., "Deletion of p16INK4A/CDKN2 and p15INK4B in human somatic cell hybrids and hybrid-derived tumors.", CELL GROWTH & DIFFERENTIATION, (199901), vol. 10, pages 27 - 33, XP001004759 [Y] 225-236 * the whole document * | [PXY] - M.S. STEINER ET AL., "Adenoviral vector containing wild-type p16 suppresses prostate cancer growth and prolongs survival by inducing cell senescence.", CANCER GENE THERAPY, (200003), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 360 - 372, XP000994781 [PX] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [PY] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.cgt.7700151 | [PXY] - ALLAY J A ET AL, "Adenovirus p16 gene therapy for prostate cancer.", WORLD JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (2000 APR) 18 (2) 111-20., XP000994791 [PX] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [PY] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s003450050182 | [PXY] - STEINER M.S. ET AL, "p16/MTS1/INK4A suppresses prostate cancer by both pRb dependent and independent pathways.", ONCOGENE, (2 MAR 2000) 19/10 (1297-1306)., XP001001577 [PX] 175,176,178 * the whole document * [PY] 12,13,15,17,21,23-38,40,41,43-93,95-108,110-155,170,172-174,179-197,199-236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1203428 | [A] - G.P. NIELSON ET AL., "Immunohistochemical survey of p16INK4A expression in normal human adult and infant tissues.", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (199909), vol. 79, no. 9, pages 1137 - 1143, XP000994720 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - R.S. ROBETORYE ET AL., "Regulation of p21 Sdi1/Cip1/Waf1/mda-6 and expression of other cyclin-dependent kinase inhibitors in senescent human cells.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR DIFFERENTIATION., (1996), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 113 - 126, XP000922642 [A] * the whole document * |