EP1235818 - METHOD FOR THE DIRECT ESTERIFICATION OF SORBITOL WITH FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danisco Cultor America, Inc. 430 Saw Mill River Road Ardsley, NY 10502 / US | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Ping, W. 11 Trumbull Road Waterford, CT 06385 / US | 02 /
WEUSTHOFF, Micael, T. 8 Monticello Ct. Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US | 03 /
STOWELL, Julian 1 The Rampart, Knightrider Street Sandwich Kent CT 139ER / GB | 04 /
MCGRANE, Paul 110 Beacon Street Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 05 /
GREUTZMACHER, Gordon 34 Crosswinds Dr. Groton, CT 06340 / US | 06 /
BORDEN, George, W. P.O. Box 304 Bat Cave, North Carolina 28710 / US | 07 /
FLYNN, Gary, J. 2 Hillside Drive Mystic, CT 06355 / US | 08 /
JOHNSON, Joe, W. 4 Bungalow Lane Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 09 /
ANDERSON, James, M. 41 Chambers Road Danbury, CT 06811 / US | 10 /
TEIXEIRA, John 44 Whitney Road Mystic, CT 06355 / US | 11 /
MILLER, James, W. 55 Bloomer Road North Salem, NY 10560 / US | 12 /
HAUSMAN, Russell, J. 15 Overbrook Road East Lyme, CT 06333 / US | [2002/38] |
Former [2002/36] | 01 /
CHANG, Ping, W. 11 Trumbull Road Waterford, CT 06385 / US | ||
02 /
WEUSTHOFF, Micael, T. 8 Monticello Ct. Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US | |||
03 /
STOWELL, Julian 1 The Rampart, Knightrider Street Sandwich Kent CT 139ER / GB | |||
04 /
MCGRANE, Paul 110 Beacon Street Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | |||
05 /
GREUTZMACHER, Gordon 34 Crosswinds Dr. Groton, CT 06340 / US | |||
06 /
BORDEN, George, W. 285 Spaniards Rd. Cape Haze, FL 33946 / US | |||
07 /
FLYNN, Gary, J. 2 Hillside Drive Mystic, CT 06355 / US | |||
08 /
JOHNSON, Joe, W. 4 Bungalow Lane Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | |||
09 /
ANDERSON, James, M. 41 Chambers Road Danbury, CT 06811 / US | |||
10 /
TEIXEIRA, John 44 Whitney Road Mystic, CT 06355 / US | |||
11 /
MILLER, James, W. 55 Bloomer Road North Salem, NY 10560 / US | |||
12 /
HAUSMAN, Russell, J. 15 Overbrook Road East Lyme, CT 06333 / US | Representative(s) | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Knoble & Yoshida LLC p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Knoble & Yoshida LLC, p/o De Vries & Metman, Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 00970894.2 | 13.10.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000US28419 | Priority number, date | US19990159563P | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 159563 P | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0128961 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1235818 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/20, C07C67/08, C07C69/21, C07C69/33 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
C07C67/08 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/533 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFHAREN ZUR DIREKTEN VERESETERUNG VON SORBITOL MIT FETTSÄUREN | [2002/36] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DIRECT ESTERIFICATION OF SORBITOL WITH FATTY ACIDS | [2002/36] | French: | PROCEDE D'ESTERIFICATION DIRECTE DE SORBITOL AVEC DES ACIDES GRAS | [2002/36] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 16.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 13.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/22] | 20.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3951945 (HEESEN JAN GERHARD, et al) [X] 1-22 * column 6, line 20 - column 11, line 12 *; | [A]US4562007 (STUEHLER HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-22 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0757031 (PFIZER [US]) [A] 1-22* page 5, line 4 - page 5, line 27 *; | [A] - GIACOMETTI ET AL, "Process for Preparing Nonionic Surfactant Sorbitan Fatty Acid Esters with and without Previous Sorbitol Cyclization", J. AGRIC. FOOD. CHEM., (1996), vol. 44, pages 3950 - 3954, XP002278710 [A] 1-22 * Section "Preparation of Esters" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf950314j | International search | [X] - BRANDNER ET AL., "Drying oils from sorbitol and linseed fatty acids", INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, (194509), vol. 37, no. 9, pages 809 - 812, XP002939340 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie50429a010 |